HI HB165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Act 064, 06/30/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Act 064, 06/30/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state and county boards to make meeting documents available to the public. Clarifies notice requirements. Accounts for electronic documents and notices. (HB165 CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Act 064, 06/30/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2017-06-30 | House | Act 064, on 06/29/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 161). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 161) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-17 2:35PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 707). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Keith-Agaran, Harimoto Co-Chairs; Ruderman. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cachola Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1069) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |