HI HB165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Act 008, 04/15/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires candidates who do not intend to receive or spend more than $1,000 in an election period to notify the Campaign Spending Commission of this intention by 6/30 of an election year, and noncandidate committees that do not intend to receive or spend more than $1,000 in an election period to notify the Commission of this intention by the 5th day before the due date of the preliminary primary report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Campaign Reports.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAct 008, 04/15/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
2019-04-16HouseAct 008, on 04/15/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
2019-03-28HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-03-28HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 538).
2019-03-28SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-27SenateOne Day Notice 03-28-19.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-03-27SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 8).
2019-02-19HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-15HouseDeferred one day 02-19-19.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Yamane, Thielen.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325.
2019-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB140 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback