HI HB1652 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 164, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 164, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes various non-general funds and accounts of the Department of Taxation and transfers the unencumbered balances to the general fund. (HB1652 CD1)
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 164, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 164, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 8-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 8-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-20-18 1:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-18-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Galuteria, Baker Co-Chairs; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 780) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-18. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 19 offered. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3433) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 137). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 898-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Tupola. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-08-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |