HI HB1659 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a pharmacy to provide a customized patient medication package to any person upon consent, with a valid prescription, and in compliance with labeling and dispensing requirements. Adds certain substances to the list of Hawaii's Schedule I controlled substances. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Belatti). Excused, 3 (Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Ohno). |
2020-07-10 | House | Floor Amendment No. 5 offered by Rep. McDermott. |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 419). |
2020-07-08 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 07-02-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 379). |
2020-07-02 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-01-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3718) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995-20) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-05 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 20 |
2020-01-30 | House | HD 1 adopted and recommitted to HLT for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Tokioka excused. |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-28-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |