HI HB1665 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 210, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 702).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 210, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 702).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of fee interests of public lands on which government-owned Hawaiian fishponds are located. (HB1665 CD1)
Title
Government-owned Hawaiian Fishponds; Prohibition on Sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 210, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 702). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 210, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 464). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kim, Fukunaga, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, M. Oshiro, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 2:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 2:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-10 2:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 5:15pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-05-01 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 4:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-05-01 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 1:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 11:00 AM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-09 3:00 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-09 3:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-09 3:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-09 3:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 589). | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Fukunaga, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-17 | (H) House conferees appointed: Carroll, Ito, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 57 | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 567). | |
2009-04-16 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 622) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1257) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-04-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-09 3:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 315). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 3-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-09 10:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 19 | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and Pine, Takai excused (2). | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Belatti. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-11-09 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |