HI HB1666 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 316, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1433).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 316, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1433).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends penalties for negligent homicide in the first degree, negligent homicide in the second degree, and negligent injury in the first degree when the incident involves a vulnerable highway user. Adds definitions. (HB1666 CD1)
Title
Highway Safety; Negligent Homicide; Negligent Injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 316, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1433). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 316, on 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1433). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33-12). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-24 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Rhoads, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-23-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-19-12 1:32PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Har, Fontaine. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 532) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Manahan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Brower, Coffman, Herkes, Luke. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision-making on Thursday, 02-23-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-23-12. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-16-12 2:40PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okamura. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-01-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) Prefiled |