HI HB1675 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the requirement for all public secondary schools to implement a school year that includes 990 student instructional hours to all school years beginning with the 2014-2015 school year. Repeals the requirement that by the 2016-2018 school years, all public schools implement a school year of 180 days and 1,080 student instructional hours for both elementary and secondary school grades. Clarifies that the definition of "student instructional hours" shall be determined by the board of education in consultation with the exclusive representatives of the appropriate bargaining units. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Education; Student Instructional Hours
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Takai, Ward Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 534) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3398) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3013) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 237). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Carroll, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Ito, Johanson, Kawakami, Matsumoto, Say, Thielen, Yamane voting no (14) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 11:00AM. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Har, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Kawakami, Matsumoto, McDermott, Morikawa, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (11) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Matsumoto; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say, Fale; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2139 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28