HI HB1692 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of the clergy to report child abuse and neglect to the Department of Human Services or to the police. Specifies that the general rule of privilege under the Hawaii Rules of Evidence for confidential communications made to a member of the clergy does not apply to communications relating to child abuse or neglect.
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-03-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-20 2:00PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2001 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1692&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1692_.HTM |