HI HB172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 037, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for Fiscal Biennium 2019-2021 for the Office of the Trustees (OHA150), Office of Hawaiian Affairs Administration (OHA160), and Beneficiary Advocacy (OHA175). Requires an expenditure of general funds to pay for the auditor to conduct or contract for a financial and management audit of limited liability companies created and used by the Office of Hawaiian Affairs. Effective 7/1/2019. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Budget Of The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 037, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
2019-06-12HouseAct 037, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 128).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 128) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Luke, Holt; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 5:40PM in Conference Room 312.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Holt, Thielen.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; K. Kahele, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 703) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1869) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:19PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HWN, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 347).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB190 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback