HI HB1765 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition of "substance abuse" and amends the definitions of "drug" and "substance" for purposes of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant violations.
Title
Relating To Intoxicants.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 18 |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2478 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/TRS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1765&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1765_.HTM |