HI HB180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a nonrefundable income tax credit to any taxpayer who hires an individual 67 years of age or older in an amount equal to 50 percent of the individual's qualified wages in the first six months of employment. (HB180 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB180 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
SB162 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - Act 174, 07/01/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
SB162 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - Act 174, 07/01/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).