HI HB1813 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the examiner of drivers to accept driver's license renewal applications from civilian employees and contractors of the federal Department of Defense more than six months prior to the date of expiration under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-07-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2105 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1813&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1813_.HTM |