HI HB1820 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the nominating authority of the representatives of the Heeia community development district, Kalaeloa community development district, and Kakaako community development district that serve on the Hawaii community development authority. Provides that the Hawaii Community Development Authority shall not have jurisdiction over the development of lands under the Stadium Authority's jurisdiction. Repeals provisions relating to the stadium development district. Amends Act 268, Session Laws of Hawaii 2019, by making the Stadium Authority responsible for expending the appropriations made by that Act and authorizing the Stadium Authority, rather than the Hawaii Community Development Authority, to issue the revenue bonds authorized by Act 268, Session Laws of Hawaii 2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3667) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, J.Keohokalole. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 06-22-20 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-16-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 135). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 861-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3). |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-29 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 01-29-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3061 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Appropriation
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Membership
Nominating Authority
Stadium Authority
Stadium Development District
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Membership
Nominating Authority
Stadium Authority
Stadium Development District