HI HB1822 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Delays the execution of a writ of possession in a summary possession action until either two weeks after the issuance of the later of either the writ or the tenant's security deposit has been refunded.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1822&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1822_.HTM |