HI HB1842 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-02-12 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-02-12 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Short form bill.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-02-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-02-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to ERB, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1842 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1842_.HTM |