HI HB1842 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DOH and DHS for homelessness service programs. Mandates the establishment of the return-to-home program. Transfers administrative responsibility for the homeless assistance working group from DHS to the legislature. Requires chairpersons of the committees on human services of the senate and the house of representatives to convene the homeless assistance working group. (HB1842 HD1)
Title
Homelessness; Housing; Homeless Assistance Working Group; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 63). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 565-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Fale, Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Hashem, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Hashem, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 01-30-14 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |