HI HB1842 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Diverts non-violent petty misdemeanants living with mental illness from the criminal justice system to the appropriate community treatment.
Title
Relating To Fitness To Proceed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Wednesday, 01-29-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Assisted Community Treatment Plan
DOH
Fitness to Proceed
Involuntary Commitment
Mental Health Evaluations
DOH
Fitness to Proceed
Involuntary Commitment
Mental Health Evaluations
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1842&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1842_.HTM |