HI HB1843 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the manufacture and distribution of cannabis seeds and cannabis clones by medical cannabis dispensary licensees. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |