HI HB1846 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds of up to $3,000,000, for Wahiawa General Hospital to construct health care facilities. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Wahiawa General Hospital; SPRB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-27-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |