HI HB1847 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules to protect herbivorous fish in all state waters. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 138). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Tokioka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 349-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |