HI HB1848 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires new developments to plan for the impacts of projected sea level rise and restricts development in areas significantly affected by projected sea level rise. Amends policies and objectives related to coastal zone management to reduce residential exposure to coastal hazards and protect state beaches and public shoreline access. Defines "beach" and "coastal hazards." Increases the minimum shoreline setback. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:13AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EEP, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP, WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |