HI HB1850 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1334).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1334).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows transient accommodations brokers to register as tax collection agents to collect and remit general excise and transient accommodations taxes on behalf of operators and plan managers using their services. Ensures that the subject property is in compliance with applicable land use laws. Sunsets on 12/31/2021. (HB1850 CD1)
Title
Taxation; Transient Accommodations Brokers; Tax Collection Agents; General Excise Tax; Transient Accommodations Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1334). |
2016-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1334). |
2016-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Kobayashi, Pouha voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Brower, Cachola, Cullen, Kawakami, Keohokalole, Kong, C. Lee, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, McDermott, Rhoads, Say, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (19) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 14 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green . 11 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Harimoto, Ihara, Inouye, Kim, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Floor amendment failed as amended (CD 1) following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 10. Noes, 15 (Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Inouye, K.Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Tokuda, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 7 offered. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 170-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 170-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Baker, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Jordan, Onishi, Yamashita, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-16 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 703). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: English Chair; Baker, Tokuda Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Jordan Chair; Onishi, Yamashita. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 648) in amended form (SD 3). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report filed. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3) following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 13; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Wakai. Noes, 11 (Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Tokuda). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3525) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TSI/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3069) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Green, K.Kahele, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Slom. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI deferred the measure until 03-21-16 2:47PM in conference room 225. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-21-16 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TSI/CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, DeCoite, Har, Kawakami, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Pouha, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Keohokalole, Kobayashi, C. Lee, LoPresti, Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Tokioka, Ward voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kawakami, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Pouha, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Onishi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Tokioka, Pouha, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2016-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2693 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27