HI HB1852 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 240, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 240, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that nonprofit organizations may receive loans from the Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund to engage in activities that are consistent with the Federal Water Pollution Control Act, including the planning, design, and construction of wastewater treatment works. (HB1852 CD1)
Title
Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund; Clean Water State Revolving Fund Loan Program; Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 240, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 240, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 36-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 36-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Cullen, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Cullen Co-Chairs; Creagan, Tupola. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2016-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 469) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3346) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2982) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 20). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-10-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |