HI HB1858 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - The committee(s) on EEP/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Sea Grant College Program, with the Department of Health, to develop and conduct a two-year comprehensive statewide outreach program that provides science-based information and understanding of sewage contamination sources in nearshore marine areas; increases understanding of sewage capacity needs; and informs all stakeholders of appropriate solutions for cesspool conversion. Requires the Water Resources Research Center to research wastewater system technologies to determine the most cost-effective way to upgrade cesspools in Hawaii and reduce their impact on drinking water and groundwater. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cesspools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on EEP/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2379 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback