HI HB1859 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the annual vehicle registration fee by $1, which will be deposited into the Disability and Communication Access Board Special Fund to cover the costs of administering parking for persons with disabilities. Repeals the deposit of application fees for the credentialing of interpreters into the Special Fund, and the use of Special Fund monies to cover the costs of administering the program for their credentialing. (HB1859 HD1)
Title
Annual Vehicle Registration Fee; Parking for Disabled Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2720) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-10 3:20PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 170). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Ward. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) M. Lee, Souki excused. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-10 9:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Sagum, Wooley excused (3). | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) .The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Pine. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-27-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to TRN, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-13 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2101 (Same As) 2010-02-11 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.