HI HB1859 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the individual shower control valve requirement of the building code by making a technical amendment.
Title
Building Codes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to WLO, CPC, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1859 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1859_.HTM |