HI HB1859 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 3-year pilot project by the University of Hawaii Water Resources Research Center to demonstrate new toilet and sewage treatment technologies and to expedite demonstration projects. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals on 6/30/2022. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 33). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 722-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2380 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Environmental Protection
Pilot Project
University of Hawaii Water Resources Research Center
Environmental Protection
Pilot Project
University of Hawaii Water Resources Research Center