HI HB1864 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that members of legislatively created task forces and working groups are not considered employees of the State for the purposes of the state ethics code.
Title
State Ethics Code; Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2183 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1864 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1864_.HTM |