HI HB1864 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-14 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-14, 10:15a.m. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Saturday, 02-08-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3030 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to EGH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1864&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1864_.HTM |