HI HB1869 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 194, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 194, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a specific exemption to the landlord-tenant code for a seller who occupies the residential real property after the transfer of the seller's ownership rights. Takes effect 11/1/2018. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Landlord Tenant Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 194, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 194, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2018-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Quinlan excused (2). |
2018-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 666). |
2018-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18. |
2018-04-23 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi Chair; Ichiyama, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 03-28-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-28-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 283). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2640 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to CPH.