HI HB1869 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of "certificate of disability" and "person with a disability" to allow a person with a disability that does not limit or impair the ability to walk and needs special accommodations to enter and exit their vehicle to be issued a disability parking permit.
Title
Relating To Parking For Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2341 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1869&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1869_.HTM |