HI HB1899 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the EUTF board to send actual, individual notice via a board approved method of delivery to EUTF members that they may be eligible for reimbursement of income-related monthly adjustment amount (IRMAA) medicare part B premium payments. Allows beneficiaries to be reimbursed for IRMAA part B premiums owed on or after January 1, 2015, without any time limitation for claiming the reimbursement. Takes effect on 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Medicare Part B.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 144). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |