HI HB19 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB19
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Malama Makalae Coast Council, which shall: (1) Study, provide analysis, and develop Malama Makalae coast siting criteria and design criteria for certain state-funded construction projects; (2) Establish a plan regarding saltwater intrusion; and (3) Establish a plan to address nuisance flooding in each county with a population of 500,000 or more. Appropriates funds for administrative and operating expenses. Dissolves the council on 6/30/2023.
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB19 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=19&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB19_.HTM |