HI HB1900 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a defendant's incarceration history certificate be provided to a court prior to sentencing or resentencing. Requires a court to determine a defendant's credit time, compute the expiration date for a defendant's specified sentence, and include the expiration date in the court's judgment order.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1900&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1900_.HTM |