HI HB1902 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Deferred one day.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Deferred one day.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, possession, sale, barter, trade, gift, transfer, or acquisition of detachable ammunition magazines with a capacity in excess of ten rounds, regardless of the type of firearm with which the magazine is compatible. Allows possession of large-capacity magazines that were legally possessed prior to the effective date of this Act. Allows acquisition by means of inheritance of large-capacity magazines that were legally in possession prior to the effective date of this Act. Allows possession and use by law enforcement agencies and officers. Allows the use of blank-fire assault weapons and detachable ammunition magazines with a capacity in excess of ten rounds for use solely as props for motion picture film or television program production when authorized by the chief of police of the appropriate county and not in violation of federal law. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Deferred one day. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Kahele . Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 06-30-20 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3621) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 38). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hashimoto, Kitagawa, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Eli, Gates, Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (16) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-19 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 02-27-20. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor Amendment No. 2 offered by Rep. Takayama |
2020-02-18 | House | Deferred one day 02-19-20. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Gates, Har, Kitagawa, D. Kobayashi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from PVM/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to PVM/JUD, referral sheet 12 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |