HI HB1915 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takai excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takai excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to notify the legislature of any proposed changes and state plan amendments relating to medicaid. Authorizes legislature to require the Department of Human Services to make changes to medicaid or submit a state plan amendment. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1915 HD1)
Title
Medicaid Program; Proposed Changes and Amendments Notification
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takai excused (2). | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 01-30-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HUS, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |