HI HB1915 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the exemption of farm-based housing for certain agricultural employees from state and local laws and regulations through a special permit process.
Title
Agricultural Employee Housing; Exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-27-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1915&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1915_.HTM |