HI HB1915 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that state and county planning efforts for the delivery of services to the aged or disabled share budgets, data, insights, strategies, goals, and definitions of success and recommendations. Reforms and improves the timely movement of funding and approvals to ensure that there are no delays in the delivery of services.
Title
Relating To Aging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2590 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1915&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1915_.HTM |