HI HB1915 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes within the department of education a workforce readiness program to provide opportunities for students to earn associate degrees, workforce development diplomas, pre-apprenticeship certificates, and other industry-recognized certificates. Requires the department to designate schools, including adult community schools, to participate in the program. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 3:15PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-06SenateRe-Referred to EDU, WAM.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to EDU/LCA, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 305).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from LHE/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Ohno.
2020-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE/LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 1:59PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback