HI HB1922 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for efforts to substantially reduce and eradicate certain invasive species in the county of Maui. Effective 7/1/2150. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 691-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-29 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-29-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2371 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.