HI HB1927 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Act 044, 4/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 502).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Act 044, 4/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 502).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the owner-builder law by: (1) Allowing an exemption for the sale or lease of a property by an owner builder prior to the expiration of the one-year prohibition period in the event of hardship; (2) Defining when a construction or improvement is completed; (3) Exempting improvements pursuant to an approved building permit where the estimated valuation as reflected in the building permit is less than $10,000; (4) Establishing fines for the failure of an owner-builder to comply with the requirements set forth in the disclosure statement provided to the owner-builder by the county. Effective July 1, 2010. (SD1)
Title
Contractors; Owner-Builders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | (S) Act 044, 4/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 502). | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Act 044, on 4/21/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 256). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 561). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Berg, Carroll, Har, Luke, Souki excused (5). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 475). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 03-30-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 495). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; English, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 293). | |
2010-03-30 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 359) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-29-10. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-24 | (S) Reported from CPN/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2854) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara, Sakamoto. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to CPN/TIA. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 66). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:35PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-22-10. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-19-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ito, Karamatsu, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 2/1/2010 2:00:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-25-10 2:00 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-14 | (H) Pending introduction. |