HI HB1927 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - (S) Recommitted to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - (S) Recommitted to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the filing deadline for certain campaign finance preliminary reports. (SD1)
Title
Campaign Finance Reports; Filing Deadlines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | (S) Recommitted to JDL. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-12 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-14-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 5). | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Marumoto, Okamura excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke excused (3). | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 12-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-26-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-26-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-24-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |