HI HB1930 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the amount of the rental motor vehicle surcharge tax from $5 to an unspecified amount. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-07-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-28 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2688 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRS, WAM.