HI HB1933 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the state building code council. Takes effect on 7/1/2025. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Building Code Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Lowen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2020-02-04HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-30HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Hashimoto; and Excused: none.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-29HouseRe-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 8
2020-01-23HouseReferred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback