HI HB1947 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for programs, ceremonies, and activities commemorating the 75th anniversary of the end of World War II. Effective July 1, 2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To World War Ii Commemoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 43). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 259-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3073 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).