HI HB1950 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to conduct a study on the feasibility of a private-public partnership to design, build, and operate an underwater tunnel for vehicle traffic to provide a more direct connection between Ewa and downtown Honolulu along with the expansion of roadways as necessary to maximize use of the tunnel. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To An Underwater Tunnel And Supporting Roadways To Provide A More Direct Connection Between Ewa And Downtown Honolulu.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matayoshi, Okimoto, Perruso, Todd voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates, B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-12-20 11:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3027 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRS, WAM.