HI HB1957 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adjusts the amount of the income tax credit for low-income household renters based on adjusted gross income and taxpayer filing status and provides for automatic adjustments to the tax credit based on the consumer price index. Take effect on 7/1/2025. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2020-02-12HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2020-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:15AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-28HouseRe-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 7
2020-01-23HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2627 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback