HI HB197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB197
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that treatment drugs such as suboxone may be used in the maintenance or detoxification of narcotic dependent persons.
Title
Relating To Administering, Dispensing, Or Prescribing Narcotic Drugs For Use In Maintenance Or Detoxification Treatment To A Narcotic Dependent Person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-08 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1080 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, CPH.
HB197 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB197 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Administer, Dispense, or Prescribe Narcotic Drugs
Maintenance or Detoxification Treatment
Narcotic Dependent Person.
Maintenance or Detoxification Treatment
Narcotic Dependent Person.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=197&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB197_.HTM |