HI HB1990 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently directs specified percentages of the general excise tax revenues to a new educational infrastructure special fund for the department of education and other entities responsible for school facilities to augment its capacity and infrastructure and to the department of transportation to protect the state highway system from the threat of inundation and damage caused by climate change and to augment the capacity and infrastructure of the State's highways. Directs specified percentages of revenues from a new, temporary state improvement surcharge to the foregoing purposes and to certain state funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 51). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Lowen, Matsumoto, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen, Todd, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 780-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-07-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LHE, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |