HI HB1996 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the BOE to include evaluation of the most current strategic plan indicators as a component of the superintendent of education's annual performance evaluation. Requires improvements in at least one-half of those indicators for any salary increase for the superintendent. Takes effect upon approval. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3644) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 53). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Johanson, Tokioka. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LHE, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |